Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 67 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4579 Week
» 27085 Month
» 330275 Year
» 1551840 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 2571 m/e 12/1902
British Railways 32571 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Billinton
Class Large Radials
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 12/1902
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/01/1956
Scrapping During 02/1956
Service Life 53 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1902
HOR Horsham on 01/01/1948
75B Redhill 4w/e 08/12/1950
75G Eastbourne 4w/e 05/02/1951
75E Three Bridges 4w/e 19/03/1952
75B Redhill 8w/e 20/07/1953
75E Three Bridges 4w/e 10/12/1953
75C Norwood Junction 6w/e 18/06/1954
   Withdrawn w/e 14/01/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 8w/e 19/03/1952
TOSTORE 75B Redhill 8w/e 03/03/1953
TOSTORE   5w/e 24/08/1953
REINS 75B Redhill 10w/e 10/12/1953
TOSTORE 75E Three Bridges 6w/e 30/12/1953
TOSTORE 75E Three Bridges 6w/e 22/06/1954
WDN   w/e 14/01/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/02/1951 Eastbourne stored locomotives Actually stored at Eastbourne on 15th February: I.lx Nos. 32005, 2009, 2595, 2603; E.5 Nos. 32571/88; B.4 Nos. 2054/62/3/8; B.4x Nos. 32043, 2052/5, 2060, 32071/2/3 (17 locos.). SLS/195103

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1902 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2571
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Horsham (HOR)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 32571    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G)    
19/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
10/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
18/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
14/01/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 32571    

prev prev