Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 4063 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22974 Week
» 87928 Month
» 290592 Year
» 3317445 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2570 |
m/e |
11/1902 |
British Railways |
32570 |
m/e |
03/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
E5X |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 11/1902 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/01/1956 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1956 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
75D |
Horsham |
5w/e |
08/10/1951 |
REINS |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
w/e |
06/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
75D |
Horsham |
7w/e |
21/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
m/e |
30/06/1952 |
ALLOC |
75D |
Horsham |
4w/e |
30/07/1952 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
4w/e |
11/03/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/01/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/03/1951 |
Brighton Works |
New 2-6-4T No. 42687 came of works on 16th March. In shops were 15211/5, 31036 (? for scrap), 31696 (? for scrap), 31851 (works No. R.O.F. 35), 31892, 32422 (lined black), 32506 (lined black), 32518, 32570, 31635: new tanks are due off 42088 (29/3), 42089 (9/4), 42090 (17/4). It is understood that 'I.3' No. 32077 and a Wainwright 4-4-0 outside works are for scrap. |
SLS/195104 |
15/01/1953 |
Brighton Works |
In shops 15/1/53: 15219, 30038 (came in green but being lined black), 30048, 30106/8, 30544/9, 30913 Christ's Hospital, 30919 Harrow, 32167/9, 32441/9, 32532. Under construction, 80059 (due 13/2), 80060 (due 2/3). No. 32570 left same day, freshly painted and lined, and 10201 was outside, possibly after trial trip. |
SLS/195303 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2570 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Horsham (HOR) |
|
|
03/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32570 |
|
|
21/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Horsham (75D) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
30/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Horsham (75D) |
|
|
13/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Horsham (75D) |
|
|
11/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
14/01/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32570 |
|
|
02/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|