Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 38 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4550 Week
» 27056 Month
» 330246 Year
» 1551811 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 2568 m/e 10/1902
British Railways 32568 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Billinton
Class Large Radials
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 10/1902
Withdrawal Sat 12/02/1955
Scrapping During 03/1955
Service Life 52 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1902
RED Redhill on 01/01/1948
75B Redhill 4w/e 08/12/1950
71D Fratton 4w/e 05/02/1951
70D Basingstoke 4w/e 01/10/1953
   Withdrawn on 12/02/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RED Redhill m/e 30/06/1947
TOSTORE NX New Cross Gate 5w/e 04/09/1948
REINS 75D Horsham m/e 31/08/1950
ALLOC 70D Basingstoke 5w/e 01/10/1953
WDN   on 12/02/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1902 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2568
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 32568    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
12/02/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 32568    

prev prev