Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1519 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19322 Week
» 72338 Month
» 191865 Year
» 3218718 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2568 |
m/e |
10/1902 |
British Railways |
32568 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Large Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 12/02/1955 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
RED |
Redhill |
m/e |
30/06/1947 |
TOSTORE |
NX |
New Cross Gate |
5w/e |
04/09/1948 |
REINS |
75D |
Horsham |
m/e |
31/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
70D |
Basingstoke |
5w/e |
01/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/02/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2568 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32568 |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
01/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
12/02/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32568 |
|
|
03/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|