Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1764 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15170 Week
» 68186 Month
» 187713 Year
» 3214566 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2559 |
m/e |
10/1901 |
British Railways |
32559 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 02/07/1960 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 9 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1901 |
FRA |
|
Fratton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
02/07/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
TOSTORE |
71A |
Eastleigh |
9w/e |
31/10/1954 |
TOSTORE |
71A |
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
16/09/1955 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
05/06/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/07/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2559 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Fratton (FRA) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32559 |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
07/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
02/07/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32559 |
|
|