Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1158 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14564 Week
» 67580 Month
» 187107 Year
» 3213960 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2558 |
m/e |
10/1901 |
British Railways |
32558 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/12/1956 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1956 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BTN |
Brighton |
P |
02/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
01/10/1953 |
TOSTORE |
71C |
Dorchester |
6w/e |
08/02/1954 |
TOSTORE |
71A |
Eastleigh |
w/e |
13/06/1955 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
16/09/1955 |
TOSTORE |
71A |
Eastleigh |
7w/e |
01/11/1955 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
q/e |
27/08/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/12/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1948 |
Brighton Works |
Engines built in May were Nos. 34073 an 34074 'Battle of Britain' Class, without names. No. 34004 Yeovil, 34005 Barnstaple and 34006 Bude came out with L.M.S. type tenders, the tenders painted un-lined black, lettered 'British Railways' in white, and the engines in standard green livery. Other engines re-numbered in May were Nos. 32507, 32398, 30900, 32546, 32440, 32506, 32558, 32523, 32395 an 34042 Dorchester. |
SLS/194807 |
31/12/1950 |
S.R. Renumbering |
By the re-numbering of Nos. 30494 an 32425 all existing engines in Classes G16 and H2 have been dealt with, while No. 30746 completes the 'Urie Arthurs.' (Incidentally according to our records 32437 was done in 10/48, 32558 in 5/48, 31841 in 11/49, and 32582 in 7/49). |
SLS/195012 |
31/01/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
ex Works: Blue, 35017/26/28; dark green, 30752, 30858, 34009/17/26/44/51/53/88/89; lined black, 30050, 30117/28, 30285/8, 30482, 30707/58 Lord St. Levan, 30909/28. B.4 dock tanks 30096/102 have lost their names on repainting. No. 32425 has been repaired here, also 32151 (lined black), 32331/7, 32558. The I.3 tank, 32076, appears to be waiting scrap. |
SLS/195103 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2558 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
02/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32558 |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
08/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dorchester (71C) |
|
|
1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32558 |
|
|