Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 489 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19400 Week
» 84354 Month
» 287018 Year
» 3313871 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2546 |
m/e |
01/1902 |
British Railways |
32546 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Marsh |
Class |
Large Vulcans |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
To Service |
During 01/1902 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/04/1961 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 3 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1902 |
BTN |
|
Brighton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
FRA |
|
Fratton |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
NOR |
|
Norwich Thorpe |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
29/04/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
FRA |
Fratton |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/04/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1947 |
Brighton Works |
: No. 21C156 Croydon and 'Austerity' 77122 have just been through shops; the former has the new pattern cab and longer deflector plates. Engines in shops in mid-November were 21C126 (new deflectors and old cab-off 21C156), 21C170 Manston fully painted), 680S, 1414, 1826/80, 2022, 2039 Hartland Point, 2083/9, 2153, 2339/66, 2436/43/55/62/89/90, 2523/46/75. For the first time for many months the shops are without an 'Austerity' and old Brighton types preponderate. It is interesting to point out that the name Croydon was borne by Rennie's 0-4-2 of 1838 (London and Croydon Ry. No. 2), but apart from this engine-which became S.E.R. No. 2 as from 31/1/1846-three engines of this name have been seen on Brighton metals as follows: Craven's 2-2-2 No. 128 which was commenced by Dodds & Son of Rotherham in 1866 and finished off at Brighton Works in June, 1871, and named Croydon by Mr. Stroudley: scrapped in 1888. Stroudley's 0-4-2 No. 181, built at Brighton (estd. Works No. 463), completed early in 1890 by R. J. Billinton, and scrapped in 1929. Bulleid's 'West Country' Class No. 21C156, completed in February, 1947, and modified in November to the 'Battle of Britain' Class (estd. Works No. 1004). |
SLS/194712 |
31/05/1948 |
Brighton Works |
Engines built in May were Nos. 34073 an 34074 'Battle of Britain' Class, without names. No. 34004 Yeovil, 34005 Barnstaple and 34006 Bude came out with L.M.S. type tenders, the tenders painted un-lined black, lettered 'British Railways' in white, and the engines in standard green livery. Other engines re-numbered in May were Nos. 32507, 32398, 30900, 32546, 32440, 32506, 32558, 32523, 32395 an 34042 Dorchester. |
SLS/194807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2546 Built at Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32546 |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (FRA) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
29/04/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32546 |
|
|
06/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|