Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 520 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18323 Week
» 71339 Month
» 190866 Year
» 3217719 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2518 |
m/e |
06/1901 |
British Railways |
32518 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 06/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 04/06/1955 |
Service Life |
54 yrs , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1901 |
EBN |
|
Eastbourne |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
75A |
|
Brighton |
8w/e |
07/10/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
04/06/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
EBN |
Eastbourne |
P |
01/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
10w/e |
07/10/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/06/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/03/1951 |
Brighton Works |
New 2-6-4T No. 42687 came of works on 16th March. In shops were 15211/5, 31036 (? for scrap), 31696 (? for scrap), 31851 (works No. R.O.F. 35), 31892, 32422 (lined black), 32506 (lined black), 32518, 32570, 31635: new tanks are due off 42088 (29/3), 42089 (9/4), 42090 (17/4). It is understood that 'I.3' No. 32077 and a Wainwright 4-4-0 outside works are for scrap. |
SLS/195104 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2518 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastbourne (EBN) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32518 |
|
|
07/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
04/06/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32518 |
|
|