Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3109 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16515 Week
» 69531 Month
» 189058 Year
» 3215911 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2512 |
m/e |
02/1901 |
British Railways |
32512 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 02/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 27/05/1961 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 3 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
75B |
Redhill |
5w/e |
31/10/1950 |
TOSTORE |
75B |
Redhill |
5w/e |
16/09/1955 |
REINS |
75A |
Brighton |
3w/e |
10/10/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
27/05/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/11/1948 |
Brighton Works |
In shops for repair: Nos, 32501 an 77359 (ready); 31919 an 32501 (nearly ready); 680S; CC1 (to be 20001); 1899, 2339, 2512, 2563, 32523, 77256; 34064 (lighter green livery). New construction Nos. 34085-90; 36001; boilers and tenders for 'Merchant Navy' Class. |
SLS/194812 |
02/12/1948 |
Brighton Works |
Locomotives in shops included:-Nos. 34056/64, both new green and lined (done at Eastleigh, in the summer), 20001 (ex CC1 to-day), 34088-90 (under construction), 36001 ('Leader'), 2325/39 an 32512 (ready). No. 34086, which ran trials at the end of November, is painted in the new light green and fully lined but not the panels, while the bottom of the engine and tender casing are all green and not black; the first one to be done here in this livery. |
SLS/194901 |
06/05/1950 |
Brighton Works |
Latest 'West Country' to 6/5/50 was 34108 Wincanton: new construction includes 34109/10 of the same order, and some 2-6-4T Nos. 42096-102. Engines under repair: 15203, 272, 1295, 1554, 32081, 32417, 32512/64, 32636, 34074, 34021 Dartmoor, 78666/90641, 78531/90408, 77359/90257, 79262/90702. No. 42096 has boiler No. 13474. Following after 42106, further 2-6-4T's will be built with standard cab arrangements, so that Brighton has plenty of work in view. |
SLS/195006 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2512 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tunbridge Wells West (TWW) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32512 |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
10/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
27/05/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32512 |
|
|
07/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|