Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2940 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16346 Week
» 69362 Month
» 188889 Year
» 3215742 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2501 |
m/e |
06/1900 |
British Railways |
32501 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 06/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/07/1955 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
ALLOC |
70E |
Reading (S.R.) |
6w/e |
05/09/1951 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
24/08/1953 |
REINS |
70B |
Feltham |
10w/e |
10/12/1953 |
TOSTORE |
70E |
Reading (S.R.) |
6w/e |
30/12/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/07/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/11/1948 |
Brighton Works |
In shops for repair: Nos, 32501 an 77359 (ready); 31919 an 32501 (nearly ready); 680S; CC1 (to be 20001); 1899, 2339, 2512, 2563, 32523, 77256; 34064 (lighter green livery). New construction Nos. 34085-90; 36001; boilers and tenders for 'Merchant Navy' Class. |
SLS/194812 |
16/06/1951 |
Brighton Works |
On 16th June, the shops contained s1, 15212, 31470, 31801, 31920, 32343, 32442, 32501/7, 32557 all under repair, remains of 32145 an 2063, while 32005 is next for scrap (possibly to be followed by 2595, which was at the shed). New 2-6-4T No. 80010 was well advanced and four more should be finished by mid-August. Boilers are numbered BR5-896 upwards and are pressed to 225lb. Now that No. 2063 is cut up, the B4 class is extinct. A small private exhibition of locomotives took place in the Works on 19th June, consisting of 42095, 34040 Crewkerne (both in spotless condition), 15227, and the almost-completed 2-6-4T 80010. On that date the diesel s1 was renumbered 15201, completing the class. |
SLS/195108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2501 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Horsham (HOR) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32501 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
05/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32501 |
|
|
11/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|