Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 751 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14157 Week
» 67173 Month
» 186700 Year
» 3213553 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2495 |
m/e |
11/1899 |
British Railways |
32495 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 11/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/09/1960 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
71D |
Fratton |
7w/e |
21/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
3w/e |
10/10/1955 |
ALLOC |
70F |
Fratton |
7w/e |
19/12/1955 |
TOSTORE |
70F |
Fratton |
q/e |
27/08/1956 |
ALLOC |
70F |
Fratton |
5w/e |
25/01/1957 |
ALLOC |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
P |
26/11/1959 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
4w/e |
05/04/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2495 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32495 |
|
|
21/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
10/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
19/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (70F) |
|
|
26/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
05/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
09/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32495 |
|
|