Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 546 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18349 Week
» 71365 Month
» 190892 Year
» 3217745 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2491 |
m/e |
09/1899 |
British Railways |
32491 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 09/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/01/1961 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 4 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
24/08/1953 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
6w/e |
08/02/1954 |
TOSTORE |
71A |
Eastleigh |
9w/e |
31/10/1954 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
12/08/1955 |
TOSTORE |
71A |
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
16/09/1955 |
REINS |
70A |
Nine Elms |
3w/e |
10/10/1955 |
ALLOC |
70D |
Basingstoke |
6w/e |
29/01/1956 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
P |
31/10/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1947 |
Ashford Works |
Locos. entering Works during the period 4/5/47 to 31/5/47 included: 1123, 1164, 1309, 1319, 1380, 1384, 1403, 1407, 1508, 1573, 1595, 2408, 2454, 2459, 2480, 2482, 2485, 2491, 2499 and W.D. 78563. |
SLS/194708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2491 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32491 |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
10/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
27/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32491 |
|
|
02/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|