Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 172 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17975 Week
» 70991 Month
» 190518 Year
» 3217371 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2474 |
m/e |
08/1898 |
British Railways |
32474 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 08/1898 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 19/05/1963 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 9 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
m/e |
30/11/1946 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
4w/e |
01/05/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/05/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/12/1962 |
Southern Region |
On 29th December, Hove goods yard dump contained 30901/11/5/23, 32338/41/2, 32417/8/74/9 but owing to shortage of power 32474/9 were removed again early in January, 32479 going to Brighton and 32474 to Three Bridges where it has taken turns on the East Grinstead shuttle service in place of H Class engines (push/pull); as a lot of time was lost running round it is understood that M7s or standard 2-6-2Ts are to be provided to enable motor-working to be resumed. Although all 'withdrawn', some '700' class 0-6-0s are still in use on snowplough work and one was stuck in a snowdrift for several days near Meldon summit. 30306 was in steam at Guildford on 19th January. |
SLS/196302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2474 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32474 |
|
|
10/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
01/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
19/05/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32474 |
|
|
06/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|