Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 984 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18787 Week
» 71803 Month
» 191330 Year
» 3218183 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2469 |
m/e |
06/1898 |
British Railways |
32469 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 06/1898 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/10/1961 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/07/1959 |
Horsham MPD (Three Bridges) |
Horsham closed from 18th July and duties and engines shared between Brighton (30047/8/9/50/1) and Three Bridges (30544/5/6/7, 32463/9/70, 32522/6/41). Shunting is performed by a Guildford 350 H.P. Diesel. |
SLS/195909 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2469 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
02/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32469 |
|
|
06/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Horsham (75D) |
|
|
18/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
10/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32469 |
|
|