|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/06/1947 | Newhaven Station | On 29/6 the 10.5 a.m. Newhaven Boat Train was worked by 2422 piloted by 2039, instead of the usual 4-4-0 pilot. 2039 has subsequently gone to Brighton Works. | SLS/194709 |
16/03/1951 | Brighton Works | New 2-6-4T No. 42687 came of works on 16th March. In shops were 15211/5, 31036 (? for scrap), 31696 (? for scrap), 31851 (works No. R.O.F. 35), 31892, 32422 (lined black), 32506 (lined black), 32518, 32570, 31635: new tanks are due off 42088 (29/3), 42089 (9/4), 42090 (17/4). It is understood that 'I.3' No. 32077 and a Wainwright 4-4-0 outside works are for scrap. | SLS/195104 |
30/06/1951 | Brighton MPD | At the shed, the hybrid Atlantic, 32424 Beachy Head, which has a black boiler off 32039 though otherwise green, was under repair. No. 32421, South Foreland was in, 32422, North Foreland was on the Brighton-Bournemouth run. No. 32425, Trevose Head, is often on relief Newhaven-London boat trains, and is reported to have worked successfully a pigeon special down from Battersea weighing over 500 tons. | SLS/195108 |
30/06/1952 | Southern Miscellany | New standard Class '4' 2-6-4Ts for service elsewhere continue to be completed at Brighton and run in from the shed there, including journeys on the evening through train to Tonbridge and back, Nos. 80036-9 being recently noted. New Crewe-built Class '2' 2-6-2Ts numbered 41310-2 allocated to Faversham are the first of the type to operate in East Kent. In addition to Sheerness branch and associated short main line trips they also work to Dover. Nos. 41313-5 commenced running from Brighton to Lewes, Eastbourne, and etc., during June when Nos. 41316-7 were expected soon to be ready as part of the allocation of the last four to Eastbourne which may include duties from St. Leonards. There is an 'E' Class Wainwright 4-4-0 still carrying Southern Railway number preceded by an 's'-s1491 stationed at Redhill at the time of writing. For several days it operated the through Tonbridge-Eastbourne turn in place of the Class '2' Eastbourne L.M.R. tank, also running to Reading and Tonbridge or Ashford. The other two remaining un-rebuilt 'Es' work from Faversham and Gillingham, the latter including duty 225 running from Tonbridge to Redhill, then after an interval to Reading and back. There is also Guildford duty 225 (Western Section) to be found on the Redhill-Reading line, a Drummond L.S.W.R. 4-4-0 turn. 'U' Class 2-6-0s have been noted working through from Andover to Cheltenham, M.S.W. Junction route, also together with S.R. 0-6-0s through Reading to Oxford or Banbury. Two lined black 'E3' 0-6-2Ts really belonging to a Goods Class are Nos. 32166, 32459. On June 7th, the advance portion of the Birkenhead-Hastings train was hauled by Atlantic No. 32422, North Foreland, which made a fast run with nine coaches from Redhill to Brighton (having been to Kensington,. Olympia, in the morning on the up relief routed via High Wycombe); 'L' Class 4-4-0, 31769 Brighton-Eastbourne; standard 2-6-4T, 80017 on to Hastings which worked goods back to Polegate at night. Atlantics will no doubt play a valuable part in haulage of summer trains to and from Brighton and Newhaven again this summer. One sometimes goes up light early on Saturday mornings from Newhaven to haul a relief boat express back from Victoria. Continental freight trains often formed to a considerable extent with braked, dual fitted Italian or similar European waggons are run several times daily each way between Dover and Southwark Depot or other London yard with timings occupying 2½-3 hr. according to route with a service stop, loaded or empty, with not less than one-third fully braked. 'King Arthur' locomotives are often employed. Their maximum load via Tonbridge is 425 tons; with light Pacifics, 500 tons; 'N' Class Mogul, 400 and so on. On account of the severity of grading, loads are reduced if Chatham or Maidstone (East) routes used. A light Pacific has been turned at Eastbourne Shed though only with difficulty. |
SLS/195208 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1911 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 2422, name: NORTH FORELAND Built at Brighton Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Newhaven (NHN) | ||
05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 32422 | ||
03/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (BTN) | ||
07/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
31/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newhaven (NHN) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
07/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
26/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
10/1956 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 32422 | ||
02/1957 | Scrapped | Scrapped |