Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 658 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14701 Week
» 79655 Month
» 282319 Year
» 3309172 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2416 |
m/e |
11/1905 |
British Railways |
32416 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
E6 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 11/1905 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/02/1962 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/02/1962 |
Ashford Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 31638, 31828/51/62/95. Works Yard: 30804/52, 30900/9/15, 31317, 31584, 31717, 31830/42/66/75, 32416. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2416 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
02/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32416 |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
01/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
18/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
05/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
17/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
10/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
10/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32416 |
|
|
03/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|