Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2621 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16027 Week
» 69043 Month
» 188570 Year
» 3215423 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2415 |
m/e |
10/1905 |
British Railways |
32415 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
E6 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1905 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/09/1961 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1905 |
BA |
|
Bricklayers Arms |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
73H |
|
Dover Marine |
4w/e |
10/03/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
23/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/07/1948 |
Brighton Works |
Locomotives under repair here (early July) included Nos. 919, 2129, S2301, 2415/77, 2547, 2644, 32576, W.D. 77101, while Nos. 34078-85 were in various stages of construction. |
SLS/194808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2415 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32415 |
|
|
10/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (73H) |
|
|
23/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32415 |
|
|
11/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|