Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 735 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24366 Week
» 89320 Month
» 291984 Year
» 3318837 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2410 |
m/e |
03/1905 |
British Railways |
32410 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
E6 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 03/1905 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/06/1961 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1905 |
BA |
|
Bricklayers Arms |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
73H |
|
Dover Marine |
4w/e |
10/03/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/07/1961 |
Ashford Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 31263, 31621/5, 31804/33/58, 31905/12, 33011/16, 80038 ; being cut up-31575, 32563. Works Yard: 30904/14/29/33/8, 31162, 31247/56, 31507, 31720/59/80, also 30932/9 and 32410/565; |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2410 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32410 |
|
|
10/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (73H) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32410 |
|
|
08/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|