Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 68 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4580 Week
» 27086 Month
» 330276 Year
» 1551841 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 2406 m/e 11/1904
British Railways 32406 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Billinton
Class Large Radials
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 11/1904
Withdrawal During 09/1951
Scrapping During y/e 1951
Service Life 46 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1904
EBN Eastbourne on 01/01/1948
75A Brighton 4w/e 08/12/1950
75G Eastbourne 4w/e 05/02/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 75G Eastbourne m/e 31/08/1950
WDN   w/e 25/08/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/08/1949 Ashford Works Ex Works: Class 'N' Nos. 31407, 31828/49, Class 'H.1' 31904 and DIE No. 15221. Yard shunting was performed by D/E No. 15220 and 'R.1' No. 31069. DIE Nos. 15222/23 are well forward, also a diesel-mechanical unit-Nos. 15224/25 will complete the current order, though it is believed a further lot are contemplated. The last 'F.1' No. 1231 was still intact and other engines in the yard were Nos. 1039/80, 1128, 1238/57, 31268, 1302/11, 31532, 1575, 31662, 1698, 31759, 31805, 1824/80, 31857/93, 1897, 1906, 31907, 1913/14, 2393, 2401/06/34/56/63/68, 2515/26/40, 33032, 34069. An interesting occupant of the shed was 'Terrier' K. & E.S.R, No. KES3. SLS/194909

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1904 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2406
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastbourne (EBN)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 32406    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G)    
09/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 32406    

prev prev