Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 66 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4578 Week
» 27084 Month
» 330274 Year
» 1551839 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 2405 m/e 11/1904
British Railways 32405 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Billinton
Class Large Radials
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 11/1904
Withdrawal During 12/1951
Scrapping During y/e 1952
Service Life 47 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1904
3B Three Bridges on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
REINS 75G Eastbourne m/e 31/08/1950
WDN   w/e 17/11/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during February included: 1041, 1066. 1090, 1158, 1162, 1234, 1265, 1337, 1430, 1481, 1558, 2306, 2309, 2357, 2384, 2405, 2407, 2408, 2465, 2524, 2538, and 2589. SLS/194704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1904 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2405
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Three Bridges (3B )    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 32405    
12/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 32405    

prev prev