Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 58 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4570 Week
» 27076 Month
» 330266 Year
» 1551831 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 2402 m/e 09/1904
British Railways 32402 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Billinton
Class Large Radials
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 09/1904
Withdrawal During 03/1951
Scrapping During 04/1951
Service Life 46 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1904
EBN Eastbourne on 01/01/1948
75A Brighton 4w/e 07/10/1950
75G Eastbourne 4w/e 08/12/1950
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75A Brighton 5w/e 31/10/1950
ALLOC 75G Eastbourne m/e 30/11/1950
WDN   w/e 24/02/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during April included: 1036, 1086, 1256, 1267, 1276, 1400, 1490, 1503, 1512, 1587, 1902, 1908, 2374, 2402, 2435, 2448, 2457, 2460, 2473, 2573, 2580, 2589, 21C123, 21C125, 21C130, 21C132, W.D. 77296 and 78666. W.D. 70853 and 77103 have been turned out painted black with standard S.R. numerals on buffer, cab sides and back of tender. SLS/194706

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1904 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2402
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastbourne (EBN)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 32402    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G)    
03/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 32402    

prev prev