Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 68 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4580 Week
» 27086 Month
» 330276 Year
» 1551841 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 2399 m/e 06/1904
British Railways 32399 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Billinton
Class Large Radials
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 06/1904
Withdrawal During 07/1953
Scrapping During 10/1953
Service Life 49 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1904
HOR Horsham on 01/01/1948
71D Fratton 4w/e 08/12/1950
75D Horsham 4w/e 05/02/1951
75E Three Bridges 4w/e 19/03/1952
70D Basingstoke 4w/e 26/05/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
REINS 75D Horsham m/e 31/08/1950
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 8w/e 19/03/1952
ALLOC 70D Basingstoke 9w/e 26/05/1953
WDN   w/e 06/06/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1904 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2399
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Horsham (HOR)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 32399    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Horsham (75D)    
19/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
26/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
07/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 32399    

prev