Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3969 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17375 Week
» 70391 Month
» 189918 Year
» 3216771 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2397 |
m/e |
11/1896 |
British Railways |
32397 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Marsh |
Class |
D3X |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 11/1896 |
Withdrawal |
During 07/1948 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1896 |
BTN |
|
Brighton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
07/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
EBN |
Eastbourne |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
WDN |
BTN |
Brighton |
on |
31/07/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/07/1948 |
Eastbourne MPD |
On 8/7, the following locomotives were stored here: 'B.4' 2044/54/62/63/68; 'B.4X' 2050/52/70/73; 'D.1' 2215/34/74, 2358, 2605; 'D.3X' 2397; 'L.1X' 2003/4/6/8/910, 2595-96, 2603, 32005. The 'B.4' and 'D.1' were mostly in a dilapidated condition, some of which still retain the large numerals on the tenders, etc. |
SLS/194808 |
31/07/1948 |
Eastbourne MPD |
Additional locomotives noted stored here in July were: 'D.1' 2283 and 'E5X' 32586, whilst of those previously stored, Nos. 2006/10/44 have proceeded to Eastleigh and No. 2397 to Ashford, for scrapping |
SLS/194809 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2397 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2397 |
|
|
08/1948 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 32397 but not taken up |
|
|