Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 824 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18627 Week
» 71643 Month
» 191170 Year
» 3218023 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2344 |
m/e |
12/1916 |
British Railways |
32344 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
L. Billinton |
Class |
Moguls |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1916 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/11/1962 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1916 |
BTN |
|
Brighton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
75E |
|
Three Bridges |
4w/e |
20/08/1954 |
75A |
|
Brighton |
6w/e |
05/10/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
24/11/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
75E |
Three Bridges |
P |
20/08/1954 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
6w/e |
05/10/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1948 |
Brighton Works |
The following were noted at Brighton in standard black livery, unlined with Gill Sans lettering and smokebox numberplates: Nos. 30425, 30951 (no smokebox numberplate), 32077/84, 32337/44/49, while No. 30806 was in Southern green, with Standard Gill Sans lettering and smokebox numberplate. |
SLS/194811 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1916 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2344 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32344 |
|
|
20/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
05/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32344 |
|
|
01/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|