Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 322 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18125 Week
» 71141 Month
» 190668 Year
» 3217521 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2037 |
m/e |
12/1905 |
British Railways |
32037 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Marsh |
Class |
Atlantics |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Kitson |
To Service |
During 12/1905 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/07/1951 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1951 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NHN |
Newhaven |
8w/e |
08/01/1949 |
TOSTORE |
NHN |
Newhaven |
5w/e |
31/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1945 |
Ashford Works |
Although 2423 was recently painted green and lined, other 'Atlantics' have left Ashford painted black, e.g., No. 2037. |
SLS/194602 |
07/03/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Engines in shops included Nos. 82 Boxhill, 2023/30/37/39/76/89, 2113, S2343, 2449, 32086, 34001 Exeter, 34003/61, 73790, 77056, 77180, 21C107 Wadebridge. |
SLS/194904 |
30/04/1949 |
Brighton Works |
A reconditioned boiler (BE.926) has arrived at Brighton for 'H.1' class locomotive No. 32037 Selsey Bill, now undergoing heavy repair. No. 34065 Hurricane ('B.O.B.' Class) which was about to leave the works in the experimental light green livery, has been repainted in the old S.R. livery with yellow bands. Re-numbered at Brighton: Nos. 32023/30 (6/4); No. 34008 Padstow (8/4); Nos. 32113 an 90527 (ex 77056) (11/4); 32525 an 34009 Lyme Regis (13/4). No. 32151, ex Eastleigh Works, was noted lined out at Brighton shed on 10/4 and on 20/4 No. 31826 was observed here in the same style. |
SLS/194905 |
31/12/1950 |
Miscellaneous |
No. 32005 'I1x', ex store at Eastbourne, was also at Hastings, Brighton and Tunbridge Wells on special local and parcel trains during the holiday period. No. 2002, of the same class, has done a lot of work since early December. Among other engines ex store were 'Hl' Nos. 32037/8, and 'B4x' Nos. 2045/67. Class 4MTTk 42071 was at Hastings on an Ashford passenger turn on 9th January, when it seemed probable that some of the 42070's were to be stationed at Ashford, though the first five were originally intended for Stewarts Lane. All four through steam workings from Brighton to other regions were discontinued after 13th January, causing grave inconvenience and annoyance to intending passengers. On the last day of service the 9.40 a.m. to Bournemouth was worked by 34038 Lynton: the 11 a.m. to Cardiff had 34041 Wilton; the 11.30 a.m. to Plymouth had 34035 Shaftesbury; while the 10.47 a.m. to Birkenhead was worked from Brighton to Redhill by 31905 (U.1). |
SLS/195102 |
27/07/1951 |
Classes extinct |
The withdrawal of 32037/8 (H1), 2002 (I1x), 2359 (D1), 389 (K10), and 1602 (T) renders their respective classes extinct. No. 1602 is particularly interesting as being the last of the Kirtley L.C.&D.R. locomotives in service: it was built at Longhedge in 1893, as No. 143, and but for the second World War would have been withdrawn in 1939: it was lately working from Reading shed. |
SLS/195109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2037, name: SELSEY BILL Built at Kitson |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
08/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newhaven (NHN) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32037 |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32037 |
|
|
09/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|