Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 4873 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20485 Week
» 119130 Month
» 321794 Year
» 3348647 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1917 |
w/e |
04/05/1935 |
British Railways |
31917 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
W |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
w/e Sun 04/05/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 05/01/1964 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/05/1935 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1917 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31917 |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
30/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
05/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31917 |
|
|
08/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|