|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/03/1951 | Ashford Works (In shops) | In shops: 1107, 31245 (late s1245), s1274, 31287, 31329, 31413, 31510, 31812/26/62, 31900/23/25, 32372 (new cyls.), 32502 (lined black), s2473 (being renumbered), 32467, 32525/65, 78597, 90226, 33039. In yard: s1178, 1335, 31789 (green), 31897, 33025, 31616, 31848. On shed for works 1174, 31408, 31461, 32486 (and 30793 for ELH). Scrap: 1157, 31160 (partly cut up), 1547, 1730, 31743, 31502, 32402, and being cut up 1443 an 32301. Building Shunting diesel-electric 15228-30 and a main-line diesel 10203. Twenty sets of frames for 4-6-2 to be built at Crewe, also many sets of all-welded side tanks for new B.R. standard 2-6-4T to be built at Brighton. Noted not renumbered: 1041, 1271, 1339, 1379. Ex shops 32523 (1 dome), 31405, 31785 (green), 31521, and lined black 31401 an 31825 (late s1825) | SLS/195108 |
11/09/1963 | Eastleigh MPD (Waiting Works or scrap) | Ex Works on 71A-DS238 (ex-30070 named Wainwright), 34030, 34102, 41290/5, 76007, D3719. Waiting Works or scrap on 71A-30065/89, 30199, 30241, 30346/68, 30500/3/11/5/6/9/48/86, 30911/30/6, 31403/13, 31637, 31794, 31810/20/79/80/90/8/9, 31900/3/5/6/10/6/21/3, 32353, 32417, 32557, 33011/21, 34023/35/71/4, 41312, 73054. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1931 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 1900 Built at Eastleigh Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN) | ||
02/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (BTN) | ||
11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 31900 | ||
10/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Redhill (75B) | ||
17/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Redhill (75B) | ||
07/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
31/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
05/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
14/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Redhill (75B) | ||
20/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Redhill (75B) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Redhill (75B) | ||
27/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) | ||
08/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) | ||
30/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
01/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Redhill (75B) | ||
18/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
11/12/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
21/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
26/05/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) | ||
10/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) | ||
30/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 31900 | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |