Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1180 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24811 Week
» 89765 Month
» 292429 Year
» 3319282 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1895 |
m/e |
03/1931 |
British Railways |
31895 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
U Boats |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 03/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 23/12/1962 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 9 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/02/1962 |
Ashford Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 31638, 31828/51/62/95. Works Yard: 30804/52, 30900/9/15, 31317, 31584, 31717, 31830/42/66/75, 32416. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1931 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1895 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31895 |
|
|
14/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
20/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
21/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
10/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
02/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D) |
|
|
23/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31895 |
|
|
08/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|