|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1951 | \"South-Western\" services | Owing to the shortage of 'Pacifics' at Brighton, 'Atlantics' and No. 31890 have been seen during May on the through 'South-Western' services. | SLS/195107 |
11/09/1963 | Eastleigh MPD (Waiting Works or scrap) | Ex Works on 71A-DS238 (ex-30070 named Wainwright), 34030, 34102, 41290/5, 76007, D3719. Waiting Works or scrap on 71A-30065/89, 30199, 30241, 30346/68, 30500/3/11/5/6/9/48/86, 30911/30/6, 31403/13, 31637, 31794, 31810/20/79/80/90/8/9, 31900/3/5/6/10/6/21/3, 32353, 32417, 32557, 33011/21, 34023/35/71/4, 41312, 73054. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1928 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 1890 Built at Ashford Works |
||
12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN) | ||
11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 31890 | ||
27/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
10/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) | ||
02/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) | ||
17/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
30/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 31890 | ||
10/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |