Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 545 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14588 Week
» 79542 Month
» 282206 Year
» 3309059 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1840 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
British Railways |
31840 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Mongolipers |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 08/1924 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/09/1964 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1924 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1840 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31840 |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E) |
|
|
07/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
07/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31840 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|