Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1077 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18880 Week
» 71896 Month
» 191423 Year
» 3218276 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1836 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
British Railways |
31836 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Mongolipers |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 07/1924 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/12/1963 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SAL |
Salisbury |
8w/e |
08/01/1949 |
ALLOC |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
3w/e |
30/11/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/12/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1924 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1836 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31836 |
|
|
08/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
13/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31836 |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|