Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1575 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14981 Week
» 67997 Month
» 187524 Year
» 3214377 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1830 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
British Railways |
31830 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Mongolipers |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 06/1924 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 05/01/1964 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/02/1962 |
Ashford Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 31638, 31828/51/62/95. Works Yard: 30804/52, 30900/9/15, 31317, 31584, 31717, 31830/42/66/75, 32416. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1924 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1830 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
01/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
01/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (AFD) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31830 |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (FAV) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
09/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
22/10/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
05/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31830 |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|