Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2613 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16019 Week
» 69035 Month
» 188562 Year
» 3215415 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1821 |
m/e |
10/1922 |
British Railways |
31821 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Mongolipers |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 10/1922 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 14/05/1964 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 7 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1922 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1821 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31821 |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
06/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
08/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
08/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
14/05/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31821 |
|
|
10/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|