Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 353 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18156 Week
» 71172 Month
» 190699 Year
» 3217552 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1791 |
m/e |
06/1928 |
British Railways |
31791 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
U Boats |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 06/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 05/06/1966 |
Service Life |
38 yrs , 5 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1791 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Yeovil Town (YEO) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31791 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yeovil Town (YEO) |
|
|
13/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C) |
|
|
10/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
06/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
05/06/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31791 |
|
|
09/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|