|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1950 | London to Hastings | Just before Bo-peep Tunnel was re-opened, several excursion and relief trains between London and Hastings were run via Ashford at Whitsuntide, one excursion from St. Mary Cray to Hastings being hauled by 31639 (73C), lined black, with totem. | SLS/195008 |
12/05/1963 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1931 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 1639 Built at Ashford Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV) | ||
12/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 31639 | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM) | ||
12/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Faversham (FAV) | ||
22/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) | ||
30/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C) | ||
14/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) | ||
21/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
06/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Guildford (70C) | ||
05/06/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 31639 | ||
09/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |