26/10/1951 |
Brighton Works |
New construction, 80021 well advanced, laid down to 80027, Under repair, DS1173, 377S, 15217, 20002, 31638, 31849, 31853, 32168, 32376, 32464, 32479, 42101. Being cut up, 32590. Waiting scrapping, 32075, 32021. Nos. 31849/53 bear R.O.F. Nos. 26 and 29 respectively. Recently ex shops: 80019 (20/10) for S.R.; 80020 (27/10) for Sc.R.; 31691 (26/10); 80013 and others of the class after attention to leaky tanks. An unusual visitor to Brighton shed is 30163 (L.11); 32347 with damaged front end is understood to be waiting decision as to repair or scrap. No. 41297 was on shed on 7th November. |
SLS/195112 |
25/02/1962 |
Ashford Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 31638, 31828/51/62/95. Works Yard: 30804/52, 30900/9/15, 31317, 31584, 31717, 31830/42/66/75, 32416. |
SLS/196204 |
10/04/1965 |
Locomotives Stored at Barry (Behind Barry Works) |
In sidings at Barry Docks: 2859, 2873, 3612, 3845, 4253, 4270, 4561, 4566, 4588, 5193, 5227, 5521, 5526, 5532, 5538, 5539, 5541, 5542, 5552, 5553, 5557, 5558, 5570, 5572, 5651, 5794, 5814, 5952, 6023, 6024, 6115, 7229, 7722, 7903, 8419, 9462, 9468, 9629, 30541, 30830, 34016, 34027, 34028, 34058, 34067, 34070, 34072, 34073, 34081, 34092, 34105, 35006, 35009, 35018, 35025, 92207, 92245. Behind Barry Works: 2807, 2857, 2861, 2874, 2885, 3803, 3822, 4141, 4247, 4248, 4277, 4930, 4936, 4942, 4953, 4979, 4983, 5029, 5043, 5051, 5080, 5164, 5199, 5224, 5239, 5322, 5619, 5637, 5668, 5900, 5967, 5972, 6619, 6634, 6686, 6692, 6695, 6960, 6989, 7027, 7200, 7202, 7325, 9466, 30499, 30506, 30825, 30828, 30841, 30847, 31618, 31625, 31638, 31806, 31874, 45690, 48431, 53808, 53809. |
SLS/196505 |
05/09/1965 |
Locomotives Stored at Barry (Behind Barry Works) |
In sidings at Barry Docks: 2859, 4156, 5526, 6024, 34067, 44123, 2873, 4157, 5532, 7229, 34070, 44422, 3612, 4160, 5538, 7903, 34072, 45699, 3814, 4253, 5539, 9629, 34073, 3845, 4270, 5541, 34081, 80067, 3862, 4561, 5542, 30541, 34092, 92207, 4110, 4566, 5552, 30830, 34105, 92245, 4115, 4588, 5553, 34016, 35006, 4121, 5193, 5572, 34027, 35009, 4144, 5227, 5952, 34028, 35018, 4150, 5521, 6023, 34058, 35025; Behind Barry Works: 2807, 4930, 5199, 6619, 30499, 45690, 2857, 4936, 5224, 6634, 30506, 48431, 2861, 4942, 5239, 6686, 30825, 53808, 2874, 4953, 5322, 6695, 30828, 53809, 2885, 4979, 5619, 6960, 30841, 31625, 3803, 4983, 5637, 6989, 30847, 31638, 3822, 5029, 5643, 7027, 31618, 4141, 5043, 5668, 7200, 31806, 4247, 5051, 5900, 7202, 31874, 4248, 5080, 5967, 7325, 4277, 5164, 5972, 9466. |
SLS/196510 |
06/02/1966 |
Woodham Bros. Yard, Barry |
5700 0-6-0PT-3612, 3738, 4612, 9629/81/2. 9400 0-6-0PT*9466. 4500 2-6-2T*-4561/6. 4575 2-6-2T*-4588, 5521/6/32/8/9/41/2/52/3/72. 5101 2-6-2T*-4110/5/21/41/4/56/60, 5164/93/9. 5600 0-6-2T-5619/37/68, 5693**, 6619/34/86/96. 4200 2-8-0T*-4247/8/53/70/7. 5205 2-8-0T*-5224/7/39. 7200 2-8-2T*7200/2/29. 4300 2-6-0*-5322, 7325. Hall 4-6-0*-4930/6/42/53/79/83, 5900/52/67/72. Modified Hall 4-6-0*-6989. 7903. Castle 4-6-0*-5029/43/51/80, 7027. King 4-6-0*-6023/4. 2800 2-8-0*-2807/57/9/61/73/4. 2884 2-8-0*-2885, 3802/3/14/7/22/45/50/5/62. Q 0-6-0*-30541. N 2-6-0-31874. U 2-6-0-31618/25/38, 31806. S15 4-6-0*-30499, 30506, 30825/8/30/41/7. WC and BB 4-6-2-34010/6/27/8/39/46/58/67/70/2/3/81/92/105. MN 4-6-2-35005/6/9/18/25. 4F 0-6-0 M.R.*-43924. 4F 0-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44123/422. SMT 4-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44901/5163/293/337/79/491. 8F 2-8-0-48173/431/518/624. S.D.J.R. 7F 2-8-0*-53808/9. Jubilee 4-6-0-45690/9. 4MT 2-6-0 B.R.-76017. 4MT 2-6-4T B1R.-80064/72/9/80/97/8/100/4/5/35/50. 9F 2-10-0-92207/14/9/40/5. Total: 152 locos. NOTES : * These 18 classes extinct on B.R. **5693 previously wrongly listed as 6692, even though latter was working at Stourbridge. The locos. above come from as far apart as Cornwall and Carlisle. |
SLS/196603 |
16/10/1967 |
Barry Works |
Dumped locomotives - behind the works: 2807, 2857, 2861, 2874, 2885, 3803, 3822, 4141, 4247, 4248, 4930, 4936, 4942, 4953, 4979, 4983, 5029, 5043, 5051, 5080, 5164, 5199, 5224, 5239, 5322, 5637, 5643, 5668, 5900, 5967, 5972, 6619, 6634, 6686, 6960, 6989, 7027, 7200, 7202, 7325, 9466, 30499, 30506, 30825, 30828, 30841, 30847, 31625, 31638, 31806, 31874, 42765, 48431, 45690, 53809, 71000, 75014, 92134. Total :58. |
SLS/196712 |
07/07/1968 |
Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks |
Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. |
SLS/196810 |