Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4301 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 15516 Week
» 6572 Month
» 352996 Year
» 3379849 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1627 |
m/e |
04/1929 |
British Railways |
31627 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
U Boats |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 04/1929 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 03/10/1965 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 6 mths , 2 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BAS |
Basingstoke |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/10/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1627 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Basingstoke (BAS) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31627 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (BAS) |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
03/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31627 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|