Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 835 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18638 Week
» 71654 Month
» 191181 Year
» 3218034 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1554 |
m/e |
12/1909 |
British Railways |
31554 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
H |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 12/1909 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 30/05/1959 |
Service Life |
49 yrs , 6 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/05/1950 |
Brighton Works |
Latest 'West Country' to 6/5/50 was 34108 Wincanton: new construction includes 34109/10 of the same order, and some 2-6-4T Nos. 42096-102. Engines under repair: 15203, 272, 1295, 1554, 32081, 32417, 32512/64, 32636, 34074, 34021 Dartmoor, 78666/90641, 78531/90408, 77359/90257, 79262/90702. No. 42096 has boiler No. 13474. Following after 42106, further 2-6-4T's will be built with standard cab arrangements, so that Brighton has plenty of work in view. |
SLS/195006 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1554 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31554 |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
01/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
13/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
30/05/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31554 |
|
|
06/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|