Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2609 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 7762 Week
» 142578 Month
» 345242 Year
» 3372095 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1553 |
m/e |
02/1905 |
British Railways |
31553 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
H |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 02/1905 |
Withdrawal |
During 06/1961 |
Service Life |
56 yrs , 4 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/02/1960 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/01/1950 |
Ashford Works |
Locomotives in Works on 3/1 included Nos. 1266/67/93, 1309/24, 1553, 31610. 1623/72, 31729, 1783/93, 31806, 1807, 31831/63, 1864. Locomotives ex Works (late December-early January) painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 31145, 31811/38, 32465. 32585. 'D.3' No. 32380 is expected to appear in lined black, as also have Nos. 32388/93 recently, so it would appear that complete extinction of this class is not at present contemplated. |
SLS/195002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1553 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31553 |
|
|
11/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
01/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
29/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
09/02/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
09/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J) |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
06/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31553 |
|
|
07/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|