Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1956 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 7109 Week
» 141925 Month
» 344589 Year
» 3371442 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1548 |
m/e |
12/1904 |
British Railways |
31548 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
H |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 12/1904 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/08/1959 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1548 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31548 |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
06/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
08/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31548 |
|
|
09/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|