Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1490 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19293 Week
» 72309 Month
» 191836 Year
» 3218689 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1315 |
m/e |
04/1909 |
British Railways |
31315 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
E |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 04/1909 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 20/03/1954 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1954 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1909 |
BA |
|
Bricklayers Arms |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
73E |
|
Faversham |
4w/e |
19/03/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
20/03/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
REINS |
73E |
Faversham |
8w/e |
19/03/1952 |
TOSTORE |
UNK |
|
10w/e |
07/10/1952 |
TOSTORE |
73E |
Faversham |
4w/e |
08/01/1953 |
TOSTORE |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
9w/e |
26/05/1953 |
REINS |
75B |
Redhill |
2w/e |
10/06/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
6w/e |
18/11/1953 |
REINS |
75B |
Redhill |
10w/e |
10/12/1953 |
REINS |
75B |
Redhill |
6w/e |
08/02/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
20/03/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1315 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31315 |
|
|
19/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
20/03/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31315 |
|
|
10/1954 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|