Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2697 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 7850 Week
» 142666 Month
» 345330 Year
» 3372183 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1161 |
m/e |
06/1909 |
British Railways |
31161 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
H |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 06/1909 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 11/11/1961 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 5 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1161 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31161 |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
20/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
20/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
10/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
11/11/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31161 |
|
|
12/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|