Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 882 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19793 Week
» 84747 Month
» 287411 Year
» 3314264 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
952 |
m/e |
05/1929 |
British Railways |
30952 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Z |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-8-0T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 05/1929 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/11/1962 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 6 mths , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/08/1963 |
Fratton MPD |
Fratton shed looked like a miniature Clapham early in August when in the roundhouse were : Lord Nelson 30850, Schools 30925/6, Beattie Tanks 30586/7, Z class 30952 and M7 30245. |
SLS/196310 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 952 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30952 |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
01/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
18/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30952 |
|
|
01/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|