Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 134 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17937 Week
» 70953 Month
» 190480 Year
» 3217333 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
938 |
m/e |
07/1935 |
British Railways |
30938 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Schools |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 07/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/07/1961 |
Service Life |
26 yrs , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/02/1948 |
Brighton Works |
No. 21C149 is in shops for conversion to 'B.B.' Class. Nos. S79203 and S1178 are painted in black livery; the latter has the number on the bunker, still, in spite of its diminutive size. The oil-burner S21C136 left shops on 20/2. 'Schools' S938 has now left, but 903 an 906 are in shops under repair. Metal sheeting is now being added to the lower half of the boiler of the 'West Country' class in addition to the air-smoothed casing. This is believed to be an attempt to avoid the oil-bath catching fire and damaging the asbestos clothing, etc |
SLS/194804 |
28/07/1961 |
Ashford Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 31263, 31621/5, 31804/33/58, 31905/12, 33011/16, 80038 ; being cut up-31575, 32563. Works Yard: 30904/14/29/33/8, 31162, 31247/56, 31507, 31720/59/80, also 30932/9 and 32410/565; |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1935 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 938 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30938 |
|
|
06/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (73H) |
|
|
08/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
08/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30938 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|