Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1440 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14846 Week
» 67862 Month
» 187389 Year
» 3214242 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
932 |
m/e |
02/1935 |
British Railways |
30932 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Schools |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 02/1935 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1961 |
Service Life |
26 yrs |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/07/1961 |
Ashford Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 31263, 31621/5, 31804/33/58, 31905/12, 33011/16, 80038 ; being cut up-31575, 32563. Works Yard: 30904/14/29/33/8, 31162, 31247/56, 31507, 31720/59/80, also 30932/9 and 32410/565; |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1935 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 932 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30932 |
|
|
26/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (STL) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30932 |
|
|
08/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|