Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3601 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22512 Week
» 87466 Month
» 290130 Year
» 3316983 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
919 |
m/e |
06/1933 |
British Railways |
30919 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
0000 |
HARROW |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Schools |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 06/1933 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1961 |
Service Life |
27 yrs , 8 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/07/1948 |
Brighton Works |
Locomotives under repair here (early July) included Nos. 919, 2129, S2301, 2415/77, 2547, 2644, 32576, W.D. 77101, while Nos. 34078-85 were in various stages of construction. |
SLS/194808 |
15/01/1953 |
Brighton Works |
In shops 15/1/53: 15219, 30038 (came in green but being lined black), 30048, 30106/8, 30544/9, 30913 Christ's Hospital, 30919 Harrow, 32167/9, 32441/9, 32532. Under construction, 80059 (due 13/2), 80060 (due 2/3). No. 32570 left same day, freshly painted and lined, and 10201 was outside, possibly after trial trip. |
SLS/195303 |
03/03/1953 |
Brighton Works |
No. 80059, the first of ten new 2-6-4 tanks left the works on 3rd March; a further ten are also to be built in this 'year's programme. Engines under and awaiting repair include 30027, 30109, 30825/37, 30338, 30951/7, 32655. 30117 an 30919 have been through shops but have not been repainted. While DS515 was receiving attention here its place at Lancing was taken by 32636; 80060 was due on 2/3 but was not ready. An unusual visitor to the shed on 3rd March was 32113. |
SLS/195304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1933 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 919 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30919 |
|
|
06/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (RAM) |
|
|
14/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
20/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
11/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
11/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
12/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
06/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30919 |
|
|
03/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|