|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/11/1961 | Eastleigh Works (Scrap Yard) | Works Yard: D5006, D6530/63, 15211, 30065, 30120, 30782, 32349, 34072, 34103, 35006, 41275. Erecting Shop: D3460/2, D5003/11, 3798, 4616/26, 7782, 9629, 30057, 30531, 31808, 32343, 33023/33/40, 34007/15/6/33/57/94, 34110, 35008/9/10/8, 41206/16/70, 41301/24, 73018/20, 73113, 75079, 76059, 80154, 92239. Scrap Yard: 30023/59, 30247, 30584, 30858/9, 30918 intact. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1933 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 918 Built at Eastleigh Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM) | ||
06/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA) | ||
28/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ramsgate (RAM) | ||
10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 30918 | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | |||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) | ||
08/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) | ||
30/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) | ||
27/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) | ||
26/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) | ||
20/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) | ||
18/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
06/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
24/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
14/10/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 30918 | ||
11/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |