Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1093 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18896 Week
» 71912 Month
» 191439 Year
» 3218292 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
914 |
m/e |
12/1932 |
British Railways |
30914 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Schools |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 12/1932 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/07/1961 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1932 |
RAM |
|
Ramsgate |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
75A |
|
Brighton |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
75B |
|
Redhill |
4w/e |
06/05/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
22/07/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
74B |
Ramsgate |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
P |
14/06/1959 |
ALLOC |
75B |
Redhill |
5w/e |
06/05/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
22/07/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1950 |
Brighton Works |
Engines under repair include 680s, 30914 Eastbourne, 32082, 32106, 32449, 32482, and 77296/90360. New construction-42070-78 and 34110; the tanks are due out at the rate of one per week commencing with 42070 on 27/10 up to 42078 on 22/12. Addendum: The engines mentioned as under repair were all dealt with during November, and further tanks laid down up to 42084. |
SLS/195012 |
28/07/1961 |
Ashford Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 31263, 31621/5, 31804/33/58, 31905/12, 33011/16, 80038 ; being cut up-31575, 32563. Works Yard: 30904/14/29/33/8, 31162, 31247/56, 31507, 31720/59/80, also 30932/9 and 32410/565; |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1932 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 914 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30914 |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
06/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
22/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30914 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|