Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1514 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19317 Week
» 72333 Month
» 191860 Year
» 3218713 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
909 |
m/e |
07/1930 |
British Railways |
30909 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Schools |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 07/1930 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/02/1962 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 7 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1948 |
Eastleigh Works |
Further locomotives ex Works painted malachite green and lined include Nos. 30779, 30805, 30913/37, while those painted black and fully lined include Nos. 30901/31. New 'Merchant Navy' Class Nos. 35021-22 are painted malachite green, but were not lined when first seen; No. 35023, which was on steam trials on 5/11, was malachite green and lined. Frames are set up for the ex L.M.S. type 2-6-4T's, which are to be built here. Locomotives awaiting Works on 5/11 included:-Nos. 902/09/10/35 and Beattie 2-4-OWT No. 3314. The only 'IlX' Class remaining at Eastleigh are Nos. 2004 an 2598, while those of the class which have been condemned are being broken up at Dinton. |
SLS/194812 |
31/01/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
ex Works: Blue, 35017/26/28; dark green, 30752, 30858, 34009/17/26/44/51/53/88/89; lined black, 30050, 30117/28, 30285/8, 30482, 30707/58 Lord St. Levan, 30909/28. B.4 dock tanks 30096/102 have lost their names on repainting. No. 32425 has been repaired here, also 32151 (lined black), 32331/7, 32558. The I.3 tank, 32076, appears to be waiting scrap. |
SLS/195103 |
25/02/1962 |
Ashford Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 31638, 31828/51/62/95. Works Yard: 30804/52, 30900/9/15, 31317, 31584, 31717, 31830/42/66/75, 32416. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 909 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Leonards (STL) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30909 |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
12/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
10/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
17/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30909 |
|
|
03/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|