Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 825 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18628 Week
» 71644 Month
» 191171 Year
» 3218024 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
906 |
m/e |
06/1930 |
British Railways |
30906 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Schools |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 06/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 23/12/1962 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
74E |
St Leonards |
3w/e |
10/06/1950 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
q/e |
11/06/1957 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
4w/e |
27/02/1960 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
4w/e |
19/11/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/11/1947 |
St Leonards MPD |
Locos. under or awaiting repair here on 21st November last included 'V' 900/6, 'C1' C28 TON, 'N1' 1877, '01' 1432, 'El' tank 2129 TON ex loan to Gypsum Mines. |
SLS/194801 |
29/02/1948 |
Brighton Works |
No. 21C149 is in shops for conversion to 'B.B.' Class. Nos. S79203 and S1178 are painted in black livery; the latter has the number on the bunker, still, in spite of its diminutive size. The oil-burner S21C136 left shops on 20/2. 'Schools' S938 has now left, but 903 an 906 are in shops under repair. Metal sheeting is now being added to the lower half of the boiler of the 'West Country' class in addition to the air-smoothed casing. This is believed to be an attempt to avoid the oil-bath catching fire and damaging the asbestos clothing, etc |
SLS/194804 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 906 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Leonards (STL) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30906 |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
12/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
10/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
23/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30906 |
|
|
04/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|